NH SB53 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-10 - Signed by the Governor on 08/08/2023; Chapter 0238; Effective 10/07/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-10 - Signed by the Governor on 08/08/2023; Chapter 0238; Effective 10/07/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the definition of the state building code.
Title
Relative to the definition of the state building code.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 08/08/2023; Chapter 0238; Effective 10/07/2023 |
2023-07-28 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/29/2023 House Journal 17 P. 18 |
2023-07-27 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/29/2023); Senate Journal 20 |
2023-07-18 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2023-2247e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/29/2023); Senate Journal 20 |
2023-07-17 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2023-2247e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 06/29/2023 House Journal 17 P. 17 |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Sen. Gannon Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/15/2023; Senate Journal 19 |
2023-06-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-1951h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/08/2023 House Journal 15 P. 6 |
2023-06-08 | House | Amendment # 2023-1951h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/08/2023 House Journal 15 P. 6 |
2023-05-31 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-1951h (NT) 05/24/2023 (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar) |
2023-05-19 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 05/24/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-05-19 | House | Executive Session: 05/24/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-05-01 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 05/24/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-04-19 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/26/2023 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-04-14 | House | Executive Session: 03/29/2023 02:15 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-03-31 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/05/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-03-21 | House | Public Hearing: 03/29/2023 02:15 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-03-20 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0518s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/22/2023; Senate Journal 8 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2023-0518s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/22/2023; Senate Journal 8 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0518s, 02/22/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Hearing: 01/17/2023, Room 100, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 6 |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Introduced 01/05/2023 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4 |