NH SB53 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 07/13/2011; Effective 07/01/2011; Chapter 0245
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 07/13/2011; Effective 07/01/2011; Chapter 0245
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the definition of nursing and the nursing assistant registry administered by the board of nursing.
Title
Relative to the definition of nursing and the nursing assistant registry administered by the board of nursing.
Sponsors
Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Sen. John Gallus [R] | Sen. Matthew Houde [D] | Sen. Molly Kelly [D] |
Sen. Sylvia Larsen [D] | Rep. Amanda Merrill [D] | Sen. Bob Odell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 07/13/2011; Effective 07/01/2011; Chapter 0245 | |
2011-06-22 | Senate Enrolled | |
2011-06-22 | House Enrolled; House Journal 57, PG.1860 | |
2011-06-22 | Senate Enrolled Bill Amendment #2011-2525e, New Title, Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2011-06-22 | House Enrolled Bill Amendment #2525e(NT) Adopted; House Journal 57, PG.1858 | |
2011-06-22 | Senate Conference Committee Report 2420c; Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2011-06-22 | House Conference Committee Report #2420c Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 57, PG.1807 | |
2011-06-16 | House Conference Committee Report #2011-2420c, House Amendment + New Amendment, Filed; House Calendar 49, PG.1674 | |
2011-06-10 | Senate Committee of Conference Meeting: 6/14/2011, 2:30 p.m., Room 100, State House | |
2011-06-08 | House Speaker Appoints: Reps Hess, R.Ober, K.Murphy, and Daugherty; House Journal 51, PG.1715 | |
2011-06-08 | House House Accedes to Senate Request for C of C (Rep Stepanek): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 51, PG.1715 | |
2011-06-01 | Senate President Appoints: Senators Luther, Larsen and D’Allesandro; Senate Journal 19, Pg.536 | |
2011-06-01 | Senate Sen. Carson Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment 1582h; New Title, Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 19, Pg.536 | |
2011-05-18 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #1582h(NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG.1555 | |
2011-05-18 | House Amendment #1582h (New Title) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG.1555 | |
2011-04-26 | House Proposed Minority Committee Amendment #2011-1614h (New Title); House Calendar 39, PG.1340-1341 | |
2011-04-26 | House Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1614h(NT); House Calendar 39, PG.1326 | |
2011-04-26 | House Proposed Majority Committee Amendment #2011-1582h (New Title); House Calendar 39, PG.1340 | |
2011-04-26 | House Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1582h(NT) for May 18 (Vote 14-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 39, PG.1326 | |
2011-04-13 | House Executive Session: 4/26/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-04-13 | House Continued Public Hearing: 4/21/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-03-30 | House Public Hearing: 4/5/2011 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 ==RECESSED== | |
2011-03-28 | House Introduced and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 30, PG.1036 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 10, Pg.187 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendments 0400s, 0450s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 10, Pg.174 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Sen. D’Allesandro Floor Amendment #2011-0450s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 10, Pg.174 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Committee Amendment 0400s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 10, Pg.173 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Sen. Carson Moved Remove From Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 10, Pg.173 | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Sen. Carson Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 7, Pg.70 | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Committee Amendment 0400s, Not Voted On; Senate Journal 7, Pg.70 | |
2011-02-17 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-0400s, 2/23/11; Senate Calendar 12 | |
2011-02-09 | Senate Hearing: 2/17/11, Room 100, State House, 9:45 a.m.; Senate Calendar 11 | |
2011-02-03 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration, Senate Journal 5, Pg.44 |