NH SB528 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-12 - Executive Session: 10/03/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building305
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-12 - Executive Session: 10/03/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building305
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to dam registration fees and relative to permit fees for constructing or reconstructing a dam.
Title
Relative to dam registration fees and relative to permit fees for constructing or reconstructing a dam.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Dan Feltes [D] | Rep. David Danielson [R] | Sen. Cindy Rosenwald [D] |
Rep. Judith Spang [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-12 | House | Executive Session: 10/03/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building305 |
2018-09-05 | House | Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 09/12/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2018-04-05 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted DV 191-149 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 16 |
2018-03-29 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 04/05/2018 (Vote 10-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 8 |
2018-03-29 | House | Executive Session: 03/27/2018 Legislative Office Building 305 |
2018-03-21 | House | Public Hearing: 03/27/2018 10:40 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2018-03-20 | House | Introduced 03/15/2018 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 8 P. 70 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1073s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-1073s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1073s, 03/15/2018; Senate Calendar 12A |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0268s, Regular Calendar 17Y-6N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0268s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0268s, 02/01/2018; Senate Calendar 5 |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Hearing: 01/23/2018, Room 103, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 3 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 2 |