NH SB521 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on December 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-01 - Pending Motion OT3rdg; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-01 - Pending Motion OT3rdg; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing Sophia's Fund to issue decals for multi-use decal plates.
Title
Authorizing Sophia's Fund to issue decals for multi-use decal plates.
Sponsors
Sen. William Gannon [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Sen. James Gray [R] |
Sen. John Reagan [R] | Sen. Ruth Ward [R] | Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | Pending Motion OT3rdg; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3 |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/01/2018; Senate Calendar 5 |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Hearing: 01/16/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:20 pm; Senate Calendar 1 |
2017-12-20 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 1 |