NH SB520 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Sen. Gannon Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Sen. Gannon Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to organizations authorized to issue decals for multi-use decal plates and relative to autonomous vehicles.
Title
Relative to organizations authorized to issue decals for multi-use decal plates and relative to autonomous vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | Senate | Sen. Gannon Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-02 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1648h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2018 |
2018-05-02 | House | Amendment # 2018-1648h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2018 |
2018-04-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1648h (NT) for 05/02/2018 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 9 |
2018-04-17 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 04/24/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2018-04-11 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/17/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2018-03-28 | House | Public Hearing: 04/03/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2018-03-27 | House | Introduced 03/22/2018 and referred to Transportation House Journal 10 P. 53 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2018-0617s and 2018-1149s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/22/2018; Senate Journal 10 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Floor Amendment # 2018-1149s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/22/2018; Senate Journal 10 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Moved to Remove From Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/22/2018; Senate Journal 10 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Pending Motion OT3rdg; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0617s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Remove From Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Pending Motion Ought to Pass with Amendment #2018-0617s; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0617s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0617s, 02/22/2018; Senate Calendar 8 |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Hearing: 01/16/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 1 |
2017-12-20 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 1 |