NH SB516 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to a property tax credit for active duty military personnel.
Title
Relative to a property tax credit for active duty military personnel.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeanne Dietsch [D] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Rep. Jon Morgan [D] | Sen. Melanie Levesque [D] |
Rep. Kermit Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Hearing: 03/04/2020, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 8 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1 |