NH SB515 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Placed on Laid on Table Consent List and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Placed on Laid on Table Consent List and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to a discrimination prevention policy in schools.
Title
Relative to a discrimination prevention policy in schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Placed on Laid on Table Consent List and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate Senate Calendar 11 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing: 02/18/2020, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 6 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 1 |