NH SB512 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-21 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/21/2010; Effective 08/20/2010; Chapter 0199
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-21 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/21/2010; Effective 08/20/2010; Chapter 0199
Summary
Relative to the community college system of New Hampshire.
Title
Relative to the community college system of New Hampshire.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-21 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/21/2010; Effective 08/20/2010; Chapter 0199 | |
2010-05-19 | House Enrolled; House Journal 46, PG.2244 | |
2010-05-19 | Senate Enrolled | |
2010-05-12 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 41, PG.1956 | |
2010-05-05 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for May 12 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar); House Journal 37, PG.1736 | |
2010-04-22 | House Executive Session: 5/4/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2010-04-22 | House Full Committee Work Session: 5/3/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2010-04-21 | House Full Committee Work Session: 4/29/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2010-04-21 | House Referred to Finance; House Journal 35, PG.1666 | |
2010-04-21 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 35, PG.1666 | |
2010-04-13 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for April 21 (Vote 17-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 31, PG.1532 | |
2010-03-23 | House Executive Session: 4/13/2010 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2010-03-23 | House Public Hearing: 4/6/2010 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2010-03-18 | House Introduced and Referred to Education; House Journal 27, PG.1441 | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 10, Pg.169 | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 10, Pg.165 | |
2010-03-11 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass 3/17/10; Senate Calendar 11 | |
2010-03-03 | Senate Hearing: March 11, 2010, Room 100, State House, 11:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 10 | |
2010-02-17 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 7, Pg.92 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2949&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |