NH SB511 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Signed by the Governor on 05/30/2018; Chapter 0151; Effective 01/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing an optional tax credit for combat service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing an optional tax credit for combat service.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-04SenateSigned by the Governor on 05/30/2018; Chapter 0151; Effective 01/01/2019
2018-05-01SenateEnrolled (In recess 04/26/2018); Senate Journal 15
2018-05-01HouseEnrolled 04/26/2018
2018-04-19HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 12
2018-04-12HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/19/2018 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 8
2018-04-12HouseExecutive Session: 04/11/2018 Legislative Office Building 301
2018-03-28HousePublic Hearing: 04/03/2018 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 301
2018-03-27HouseIntroduced 03/22/2018 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 10 P. 53
2018-03-21SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2018-1105s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/21/2018; Senate Journal 9
2018-03-21SenateCommittee Amendment # 2018-1105s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/21/2018; Senate Journal 9
2018-03-14SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1105s, 03/21/2018; Senate Calendar 13
2018-01-10SenateHearing: 01/31/2018, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:40 am; Senate Calendar 3
2017-12-20SenateTo Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback