NH SB511 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-23 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 07/23/2010; Effective 07/23/2010; Chapter 0371
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-23 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 07/23/2010; Effective 07/23/2010; Chapter 0371
Summary
Relative to an exemption from the tax on gambling winnings.
Title
Relative to an exemption from the tax on gambling winnings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-23 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 07/23/2010; Effective 07/23/2010; Chapter 0371 | |
2010-05-13 | Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 19, Pg.639 | |
2010-05-13 | House Enrolled; House Journal 42, PG.2153 | |
2010-05-05 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 38, PG.1907 | |
2010-04-27 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for May 5 (Vote 12-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 34, PG.1629 | |
2010-04-14 | House Executive Session: 4/22/2010 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2010-04-14 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 4/22/2010 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 ==TIME CHANGE (Orig 11:00 Amendment)== | |
2010-03-31 | House Public Hearing: 4/13/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2010-03-24 | House Introduced and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 30, PG.1521 | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 11, Pg.256 | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1127s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 11, Pg.251 | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Committee Amendment 1127s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 11, Pg.251 | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment 1127s, 3/24/10; Senate Calendar 12 | |
2010-03-03 | Senate Hearing: March 11, 2010, Room 100, State House, 10:45 a.m.; Senate Calendar 10 | |
2010-02-17 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 7, Pg.92 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2944&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |