NH SB51 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the statute of limitations for recovery of a deficiency judgment after a mortgage foreclosure.
Title
Relative to the statute of limitations for recovery of a deficiency judgment after a mortgage foreclosure.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 3/26/15; Senate Calendar 14 |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Hearing: 1/20/15, Room 100, State House, 10:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 6 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 4 |