NH SB51 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-05 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 07/05/2011; Effective 09/03/2011; Chapter 0235
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-05 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 07/05/2011; Effective 09/03/2011; Chapter 0235
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the establishment of an inter-departmental team to address issues concerning certain adults with developmental disabilities who may present a substantial risk to the community.
Title
Relative to the establishment of an inter-departmental team to address issues concerning certain adults with developmental disabilities who may present a substantial risk to the community.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-05 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 07/05/2011; Effective 09/03/2011; Chapter 0235 | |
2011-06-22 | Senate Enrolled | |
2011-06-22 | House Enrolled; House Journal 57, PG.1859 | |
2011-06-22 | Senate Enrolled Bill Amendment #2011-2516e Adopted | |
2011-06-08 | House Enrolled Bill Amendment #2516e Adopted; House Journal 51, PG.1728 | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Sen. Bradley Concurs with House Amendment #1452h, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 20, Pg.551 | |
2011-05-25 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 350-28; House Journal 46, PG.1598-1600 | |
2011-05-25 | House Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Blankenbeker); House Journal 46, PG.1579 | |
2011-05-17 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for May 25 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 41, PG.1391 | |
2011-05-10 | House Executive Session: 5/17/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2011-05-10 | House Public Hearing: 5/17/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2011-05-04 | House Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 42, PG.1419 | |
2011-05-04 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #1452h(NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 42, PG.1419 | |
2011-05-04 | House Amendment #1452h(NT) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 42, PG.1419 | |
2011-04-26 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-1452h (New Title); House Calendar 36, PG.1274-1275 | |
2011-04-26 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1452h(NT) for May 4 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 36, PG.1245 | |
2011-04-14 | House Executive Session: 4/26/2011 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 | |
2011-04-14 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 4/19/2011 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 | |
2011-04-05 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 4/12/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 | |
2011-03-29 | House Public Hearing: 4/5/2011 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 | |
2011-03-28 | House Introduced and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 30, PG.1036 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 10, Pg.187 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0793s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 10, Pg.182 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Committee Amendment 0793s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 10, Pg.182 | |
2011-03-11 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-0793s, New Title, 3/23/11; Senate Calendar 16 | |
2011-01-21 | Senate Hearing: 2/03/11, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-19 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Health and Human Services, Senate Journal 3, Pg.33 |