NH SB507 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 5 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-05 - Enrolled 05/23/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Proclaiming June as post-traumatic stress injury (PTSI) awareness month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proclaiming June as post-traumatic stress injury (PTSI) awareness month.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-05HouseEnrolled 05/23/2018
2018-06-04SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-05-23SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1957e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-05-22HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1957e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018
2018-05-02SenateSen. Gray Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
2018-04-19HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 1350h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 6
2018-04-19HouseAmendment # 2018-1350h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 6
2018-04-12HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1350h for 04/19/2018 (Vote 11-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 6
2018-04-05HouseExecutive Session: 04/04/2018 Legislative Office Building 306
2018-03-20House==ROOM CHANGE== Public Hearing: 04/04/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306-308
2018-03-12HouseIntroduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 7 P. 52
2018-02-01SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3
2018-01-17SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/01/2018; Senate Calendar 5
2018-01-03SenateHearing: 01/17/2018, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 2
2017-12-20SenateTo Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback