NH SB507 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-17 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 05/13/2010; Effective 05/13/2010; Chapter 0030
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-17 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 05/13/2010; Effective 05/13/2010; Chapter 0030
Summary
Relative to the Masonic Home.
Title
Relative to the Masonic Home.
Sponsors
Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Sen. Betsi DeVries [D] | Rep. David Nixon [D] | Sen. Bob Odell [R] |
Sen. Sheila Roberge [R] | Rep. Kenneth Weyler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-17 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 05/13/2010; Effective 05/13/2010; Chapter 0030 | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Enrolled | |
2010-05-05 | House Enrolled | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Sen. Cilley Concurs with House Amendment 1256h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2010-04-21 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #1256h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 35, PG.1655 | |
2010-04-21 | House Amendment #1256h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 35, PG.1655 | |
2010-04-14 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #1256h; House Calendar 31, PG.1574 | |
2010-04-14 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1256h for April 21 (Vote 15-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 31, PG.1525 | |
2010-04-07 | House Executive Session: 4/13/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2010-03-31 | House Public Hearing: 4/6/2010 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2010-03-24 | House Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 30, PG.1521 | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 11, Pg.256 | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 11, Pg.212 | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass 3/24/10; Senate Calendar 12 | |
2010-03-11 | Senate Hearing: === TIME CHANGE === March 16, 2010, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 2:45 p.m.; Senate Calendar 11 | |
2010-03-04 | Senate Hearing: March 16, 2010, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 2:30 p.m.; Senate Calendar 10 | |
2010-02-17 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 7, Pg.92 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2950&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |