NH SB502 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-18 - Executive Session: 10/02/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building302
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to transparency and standards for acquisition transactions in health care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to transparency and standards for acquisition transactions in health care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-02 - Senate - Interim Study (Y: 170 N: 160 NV: 30 Abs: 31) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-18HouseExecutive Session: 10/02/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building302
2018-08-22HouseInterim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 09/18/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building304
2018-05-02HouseRefer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 170-160 05/02/2018
2018-04-25HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2018-04-25HouseMajority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 05/02/2018 (Vote 11-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 12
2018-04-25House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 04/24/2018 Legislative Office Building 302
2018-04-18HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 04/24/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2018-04-17House==CONTINUED== Subcommittee Work Session: 04/18/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2018-04-12House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/17/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2018-04-12House==RECESSED== Subcommittee Work Session: 04/17/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304
2018-04-04HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 04/11/2018 01:45 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2018-03-28HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 04/04/2018 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2018-03-20HousePublic Hearing: 03/27/2018 01:45 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2018-03-12HouseIntroduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 7 P. 52
2018-02-22SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5
2018-02-14SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/22/2018; Senate Calendar 8
2018-01-05SenateHearing: 01/16/2018, Room 100, State House, 09:50 am; Senate Calendar 2A
2017-12-20SenateTo Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback