NH SB501 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Vacated and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the Honor and Remember Flag.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the Honor and Remember Flag.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30HouseVacated and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020
2020-06-03HouseIntroduced 03/12/2020 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs
2020-03-05SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5
2020-02-12SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/05/2020; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 9
2020-02-04SenateHearing: 02/12/2020, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 6
2020-01-08SenateTo Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback