NH SB500 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - II. Remainder Effective 08/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amending references to firearms terminology.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending references to firearms terminology.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-12 - Senate - OTPA (Y: 184 N: 146 NV: 26 Abs: 36) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-29SenateII. Remainder Effective 08/24/2018
2018-06-29SenateI. Sections 3 6 and 11 of this act shall take effect as provided in Section 12
2018-06-29SenateSigned by the Governor on 06/25/2018; Chapter 0324
2018-06-05HouseEnrolled 05/23/2018
2018-06-04SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-05-23SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1958e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-05-22HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1958e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018
2018-05-02SenateSen. Carson Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
2018-04-12HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 1255h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 184-146 04/12/2018 House Journal 12 P. 15
2018-04-12HouseAmendment # 2018-1255h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/12/2018 House Journal 12 P. 14
2018-04-04HouseMinority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study
2018-04-04HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1255h for 04/12/2018 (Vote 12-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 8
2018-04-03HouseExecutive Session: 04/03/2018 Legislative Office Building 307
2018-03-28HouseFull Committee Work Session: 04/03/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303
2018-03-20HouseFull Committee Work Session: 03/27/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307
2018-03-14HousePublic Hearing: 03/20/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307
2018-03-12HouseIntroduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources House Journal 7 P. 53
2018-03-08SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2018-0966s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6
2018-03-08SenateCommittee Amendment # 2018-0966s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6
2018-03-07SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0966s, 03/08/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 10A
2018-01-31SenateHearing: 02/13/2018, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 6
2017-12-20SenateTo Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback