NH SB500 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-20 - Signed by the Governor on 06/10/2016; Chapter 0257; Effective 01/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-20 - Signed by the Governor on 06/10/2016; Chapter 0257; Effective 01/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to student health insurance plans.
Title
Relative to student health insurance plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - House - OTP (Y: 256 N: 84 NV: 18 Abs: 40) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-20 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/10/2016; Chapter 0257; Effective 01/01/2017 |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/01/2016); Senate Journal 20 |
2016-06-02 | House | Enrolled 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 56 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2016-1993e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/19/2016); Senate Journal 19 |
2016-05-23 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2016-1993e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 29 |
2016-05-11 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 17 |
2016-05-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/11/2016 (Vote 26-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 29 P. 10 |
2016-04-21 | House | Executive Session: 05/04/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2016-05-03 | House | ==CONTINUED== Division I Work Session: 05/04/2016 08:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 212 |
2016-04-21 | House | ==RECESSED== Division I Work Session: 05/03/2016 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 212 |
2016-04-20 | House | Division I Work Session: 04/26/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 212 |
2016-04-20 | House | Referred to Finance 04/20/2016 House Journal 36 P. 15 |
2016-04-20 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 256-84 04/20/2016 House Journal 36 P. 13 |
2016-04-14 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/20/2016 (Vote 16-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 24 P. 13 |
2016-04-06 | House | Executive Session: 04/12/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2016-03-29 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/05/2016 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2016-03-16 | House | Public Hearing: 03/29/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2016-03-15 | House | Introduced 03/10/2016 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 25 P. 118 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/10/2016; Senate Journal 8 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/10/2016; Senate Calendar 9 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/18/2016; Senate Journal 6 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/18/2016; Senate Calendar 6 |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Hearing: 02/09/2016, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 5 |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Introduced 01/14/2016 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 2 |