NH SB496 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2018; Chapter 0230; Effective 06/08/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to mediation for certain child support arrearages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to mediation for certain child support arrearages.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-14SenateSigned by the Governor on 06/08/2018; Chapter 0230; Effective 06/08/2018
2018-05-15HouseEnrolled 05/10/2018
2018-05-15SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-05-02SenateSen. Carson Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
2018-04-19HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 1259h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 3
2018-04-19HouseAmendment # 2018-1259h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 3
2018-04-11HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1259h for 04/19/2018 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 3
2018-04-11HouseExecutive Session: 04/10/2018 Legislative Office Building 206
2018-03-14HousePublic Hearing: 03/27/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206
2018-03-12HouseIntroduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 7 P. 52
2018-02-01SenateOught to Pass with Amendments 2018-0301s and 2018-0419s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3
2018-02-01SenateSen. Carson Floor Amendment # 2018-0419s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3
2018-02-01SenateCommittee Amendment # 2018-0301s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3
2018-02-01SenateSen. Carson Moved to Remove SB 496-FN from the Consent Calendar; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3
2018-01-25SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0301s, 02/01/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 5
2018-01-05SenateHearing: 01/16/2018, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 2A
2017-12-20SenateTo Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback