NH SB492 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the electric renewable portfolio standard.
Title
Relative to the electric renewable portfolio standard.
Sponsors
Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. Jay Kahn [D] | Rep. Howard Moffett [D] | Rep. Kenneth Wells [D] |
Rep. Peter Somssich [D] | Rep. Robert Backus [D] | Rep. Kat McGhee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | ==CANCELLED== Hearing: 03/17/2020, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 11 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 1 |