NH SB49 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Signed by the Governor on 07/02/2013; Chapter 0179; Effective 08/31/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Signed by the Governor on 07/02/2013; Chapter 0179; Effective 08/31/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to appeals of planning board decisions.
Title
Relative to appeals of planning board decisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-03 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/02/2013; Chapter 0179; Effective 08/31/2013 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-06-12 | House | Enrolled, Recess of 6/5/13; House Journal 49, PG.1654 |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Sen. Boutin Moved Concur with House Amendment 1264h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-05-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1264h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 41, PG.1390 |
2013-05-08 | House | Amendment #1264h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 41, PG.1390 |
2013-04-30 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-1264h; House Calendar36, PG.1214 |
2013-04-30 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1264h for May 8 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar36, PG.1198 |
2013-04-24 | House | Executive Session: 4/30/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-04-09 | House | Public Hearing: 4/17/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-03-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 31, PG.1074 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0240s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 5 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0240s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0240s, 2/14/13; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 8 |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Hearing: 2/6/13, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 7 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Public & Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4 |