NH SB49 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-18 - House ==RECONVENE== Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/27/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-18 - House ==RECONVENE== Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/27/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to tip pooling arrangements.
Title
Relative to tip pooling arrangements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-18 | House ==RECONVENE== Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/27/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2011-10-18 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/27/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2011-10-14 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/18/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 ==RECESSED== | |
2011-10-14 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/18/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 | |
2011-09-27 | House Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 10/4/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2011-09-13 | House Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 9/21/2011 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2011-09-12 | House ==CANCELLED== Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 9/20/2011 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2011-05-24 | House Retained in Committee | |
2011-05-10 | House Executive Session: 5/24/2011 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2011-05-04 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 5/10/2011 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2011-05-04 | House Full Committee Work Session: 5/10/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2011-04-26 | House Full Committee Work Session: 5/3/2011 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2011-04-05 | House Public Hearing: 4/12/2011 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2011-03-16 | House Introduced and Referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services; House Journal 28, Pg.882 | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 7, Pg.77 | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0472s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 7, Pg.66 | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Sen. Sanborn Floor Amendment #2011-0472s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 7, Pg.66 | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Sen. Sanborn Moved Remove From Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 7, Pg.66 | |
2011-02-16 | Senate Sen. Sanborn Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote, Senate Journal 6, Pg.53 | |
2011-02-16 | Senate Ought to Pass Not Voted On, Senate Journal 6, Pg.53 | |
2011-02-08 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 2/16/2011; Senate Calendar 11 | |
2011-01-26 | Senate Hearing: 2/1/2011, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 9 | |
2011-01-19 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Commerce, Senate Journal 3, Pg.33 |