NH SB489 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-14 - Special Order to the end of the Regular Calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 02/13/2020; Senate Journal 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the absentee ballot application process.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the absentee ballot application process.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-13 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-14SenateSpecial Order to the end of the Regular Calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 02/13/2020; Senate Journal 4
2020-02-13SenateInexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 02/13/2020; Senate Journal 4
2020-02-05SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 02/13/2020; Senate Calendar 6
2020-01-08SenateTo Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1
2020-01-08SenateHearing: 01/16/2020, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 11:00 am; Senate Calendar 2

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback