NH SB482 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Signed by the Governor on 05/30/2018; Chapter 0144; Effective 07/29/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Signed by the Governor on 05/30/2018; Chapter 0144; Effective 07/29/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to confidential emergency medical and trauma services data.
Title
Relative to confidential emergency medical and trauma services data.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/30/2018; Chapter 0144; Effective 07/29/2018 |
2018-05-09 | House | Enrolled 05/03/2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/03/2018); Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1801e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 04/26/2018); Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-01 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1801e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 19 |
2018-04-10 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/19/2018 (Vote 15-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 12 |
2018-04-04 | House | Executive Session: 04/03/2018 Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-03-29 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/03/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-03-20 | House | Public Hearing: 03/28/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 7 P. 52 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/01/2018; Senate Calendar 5 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Hearing: 01/24/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 4 |
2017-12-20 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |