NH SB480 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Placed on Laid on Table Consent List and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to participation in school sports programs for female student athletes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to participation in school sports programs for female student athletes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-16SenatePlaced on Laid on Table Consent List and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-03-10SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate Senate Calendar 11
2020-03-05Senate==RECONVENE== Hearing: 03/10/2020, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 10
2020-02-05Senate==RECESSED== Hearing: 03/03/2020, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 10
2020-01-08SenateTo Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback