NH SB480 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on December 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Limiting the use of electroconvulsive therapy.
Title
Limiting the use of electroconvulsive therapy.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Rep. Richard Hinch [R] |
Rep. William Marsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 02/22/2018; Senate Calendar 8 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Hearing: 02/13/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 7 |
2017-12-20 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |