NH SB480 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-20 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 07/20/2010; Effective 09/18/2010; Chapter 0354
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-20 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 07/20/2010; Effective 09/18/2010; Chapter 0354
Summary
Relative to appeals of decisions by the department of environmental services.
Title
Relative to appeals of decisions by the department of environmental services.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Rep. Jacalyn Cilley [D] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Rep. Lawrence Kappler [R] |
Sen. Bette Lasky [D] | Rep. Amanda Merrill [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-20 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 07/20/2010; Effective 09/18/2010; Chapter 0354 | |
2010-06-02 | House Enrolled | |
2010-06-02 | Senate Enrolled | |
2010-06-02 | Senate Enrolled Bill Amendment #2424 Adopted | |
2010-06-02 | House Enrolled Bill Amendment #2424 Adopted | |
2010-06-02 | Senate Conference Committee Report 2244; Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2010-06-02 | House Conference Committee Report #2244 Adopted, Regular Calendar 197-159 | |
2010-05-27 | House Conference Committee Report #2244, House Amendment + New Amendment, Filed; House Calendar 43, PG.2159 | |
2010-05-26 | Senate C of C Meeting: == RECONVENE === May 26, 2010, Room 104, Legislative Office Building, 8:00 a.m. | |
2010-05-26 | Senate C of C Meeting: == RECESSED === May 25, 2010, Room 104, Legislative Office Building, 2:00 p.m. | |
2010-05-26 | House Conferee Change: Rep Cote Replaces Rep Rowe; House Journal 46, PG.2247 | |
2010-05-24 | Senate C of C Meeting: == RECONVENE === May 25, 2010, Room 104, Legislative Office Building, 2:00 p.m. | |
2010-05-24 | Senate C of C Meeting: == RECESSED === May 24, 2010, Room 104, Legislative Office Building, 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-05-19 | Senate Committee of Conference Meeting: 5/24/2010 1:00 p.m., Room 104, Legislative Office Building | |
2010-05-19 | House Speaker Appoints: Reps G.Richardson, Wall, L.Weber & Rowe; House Journal 46, PG.2241 | |
2010-05-19 | House House Accedes to Request for Comm of Conf (Rep Hess): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 46, PG.2241 | |
2010-05-19 | Senate President Appoints: Senators Fuller Clark, Merrill and Bradley; Senate Journal 20, Pg.646 | |
2010-05-19 | Senate Sen. Fuller Clark Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment 1737h; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2010-05-13 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #1737h: Motion Adopted Division Vote 199-125; House Journal 42, PG.2105-2111 | |
2010-05-13 | House Floor Amendment #2052h (Rep W.O'Brien) Failed, Regular Calendar 144-179; House Journal 42, PG.2108-2111 | |
2010-05-13 | House Amendment #1737h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 42, PG.2105-2108 | |
2010-05-12 | House Special Order to Next Session Day, Without Objection; House Journal 41, PG.2097 | |
2010-05-03 | House Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Journal 37, PG.1745-1746 | |
2010-05-03 | House Prposed Majority Committee Amendment #1737h; House Journal 37, PG.1841-1842 | |
2010-05-03 | House Majority Comm Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1737h for May 12 (Vote 13-5; Regular Calendar); House Journal 37, PG.1745-1746 | |
2010-04-27 | House Executive Session: 4/29/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2010-04-27 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 4/29/2010 9:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2010-04-22 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 4/27/2010 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2010-04-15 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 4/22/2010 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2010-04-07 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 4/15/2010 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2010-03-31 | House Public Hearing: 4/6/2010 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2010-03-24 | House Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 30, PG.1521 | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 11, Pg.256 | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1106s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 11, Pg.203 | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Committee Amendment 1106s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 11, Pg.203 | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment 1106s, 3/24/10; Senate Calendar 12 | |
2010-01-28 | Senate Hearing: February 4, 2010, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 5 | |
2010-01-21 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Energy, Environment and Economic Development; Senate Journal 3, Pg.46 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2780&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |