NH SB48 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Public Hearing: 03/16/2021 10:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/97636968924 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the formula used to determine current use tax rates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the formula used to determine current use tax rates.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-16HousePublic Hearing: 03/16/2021 10:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/97636968924 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-03-10HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 02/25/2021 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 4 P. 48
2021-02-04SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 02/04/2021; Senate Journal 3
2021-01-28SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/04/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 9
2021-01-21SenateRemote Hearing: 01/27/2021, 01:30 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 8
2021-01-19SenateIntroduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 3

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback