NH SB48 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-11 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/11/2012; Chapter 0177; Effective 08/10/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-11 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/11/2012; Chapter 0177; Effective 08/10/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to state regulation of telephone service providers and clarifying the authority of the public utilities commission to regulate pole attachments.
Title
Relative to state regulation of telephone service providers and clarifying the authority of the public utilities commission to regulate pole attachments.
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Lambert [R] | Sen. Jim Luther [R] | Sen. Bob Odell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-11 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/11/2012; Chapter 0177; Effective 08/10/2012 | |
2012-06-05 | Senate Enrolled (05/23/12) | |
2012-05-30 | House Enrolled; House Journal 47, PG.2508 | |
2012-05-23 | Senate Enrolled Bill Amendment #2012-2371e Adopted | |
2012-05-17 | House Enrolled Bill Amendment #2371e Adopted; House Journal 46, PG.2495 | |
2012-05-17 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 46, PG.2448 | |
2012-05-10 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for May 15 (Vote 17-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 37, PG.2046-2047 | |
2012-04-18 | House Executive Session: 5/8/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 | |
2012-04-18 | House Continued Public Hearing: 5/1/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 ==Executive Session May Follow== | |
2012-04-04 | House Continued Public Hearing: 4/17/2012 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 ==RECESSED== | |
2012-02-29 | House ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 3/20/2012 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 ==RECESSED== | |
2012-02-22 | House ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 3/13/2012 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 | |
2012-02-08 | House Introduced and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy; House Journal 15, PG.848 | |
2012-01-18 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0200s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 2, Pg.41 | |
2012-01-18 | Senate Committee Amendment 0200s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 2, Pg.41 | |
2012-01-12 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2012-0200s, New Title, 1/18/12; Senate Calendar 3 | |
2011-02-16 | Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote, Senate Journal 5, Pg.56 | |
2011-02-08 | Senate Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 2/16/2011; Senate Calendar 11 | |
2011-01-21 | Senate Hearing: === TIME CHANGE === 2/03/11, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:45 a.m.; Senate Calendar 9 | |
2011-01-19 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources, Senate Journal 3, Pg.33 |