NH SB478 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - II. Remainder shall take effect 06/12/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - II. Remainder shall take effect 06/12/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing an advisory council on lactation.
Title
Establishing an advisory council on lactation.
Sponsors
Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. Martha Hennessey [D] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Rep. Rebecca Mcbeath [D] |
Rep. Edward Butler [D] | Rep. Karen Umberger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | Senate | II. Remainder shall take effect 06/12/2018 |
2018-06-18 | Senate | I. Section 3 Effective 12/01/2020 |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/12/2018; Chapter 0260 |
2018-05-23 | House | Enrolled 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1963e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1963e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-26 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1351h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-26 | House | Amendment # 2018-1351h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-18 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1351h for 04/26/2018 (Vote 22-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 6 |
2018-04-11 | House | Executive Session: 04/17/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2018-03-27 | House | Public Hearing: 04/03/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 7 P. 53 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0977s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0977s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0977s, 03/08/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 10A |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Hearing: 02/13/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 7 |
2017-12-20 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |