NH SB477 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a council on the creative economy.
Title
Establishing a council on the creative economy.
Sponsors
Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. Jeanne Dietsch [D] | Sen. Shannon Chandley [D] | Sen. Jay Kahn [D] |
Rep. David Danielson [R] | Rep. Matthew Wilhelm [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-06-30 | House | Vacated and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 2 |
2020-03-10 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/17/2020 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2020-03-10 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 03/17/2020 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2020-02-27 | House | Public Hearing: 03/05/2020 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2020-02-03 | House | Introduced 01/09/2020 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 2 P. 59 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/30/2020; Senate Journal 2 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/30/2020; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 4 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Hearing: 01/22/2020, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 3 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 1 |