NH SB475 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-20 - Executive Session: 10/16/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building205
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to testing for Lyme disease.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to testing for Lyme disease.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-20HouseExecutive Session: 10/16/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building205
2018-09-20HouseInterim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 09/27/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building205
2018-04-26HouseRefer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/26/2018
2018-04-18HouseCommittee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 04/26/2018 (Vote 22-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 6
2018-04-11HouseExecutive Session: 04/17/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2018-04-03HousePublic Hearing: 04/10/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2018-03-20HouseIntroduced 03/15/2018 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 8 P. 70
2018-03-14SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2018-0978s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/14/2018; Senate Journal 7
2018-03-14SenateSen. Daniels Moved to Remove From Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2018; Senate Journal 7
2018-03-14SenatePending Motion Ought to Pass with Amendment #2018-0978s; 03/14/2018; Senate Journal 7
2018-03-14SenateSen. Daniels Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2018; Senate Journal 7
2018-03-14SenateCommittee Amendment # 2018-0978s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2018; Senate Journal 7
2018-03-08SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0978s, 03/14/2018; Senate Calendar 11
2018-03-08SenateSpecial Order to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6
2018-03-06SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0978s, 03/08/2018; Senate Calendar 10A
2018-01-18SenateHearing: 01/24/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 4
2017-12-20SenateTo Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback