NH SB475 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED === Senate Journal 9, Pg.132
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED === Senate Journal 9, Pg.132
Summary
Relative to alcoholic beverage advertising restrictions.
Title
Relative to alcoholic beverage advertising restrictions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-10 | Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED === Senate Journal 9, Pg.132 | |
2010-03-04 | Senate Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 3/10/10; Senate Calendar 10 | |
2010-02-10 | Senate Hearing: February 16, 2010, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 7 | |
2010-01-13 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Commerce, Labor and Consumer Protection; Senate Journal 2, Pg.31 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2903&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |