NH SB47 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-20 - Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Municipal and County Government
Pending: House Municipal and County Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a commission to study barriers to increased density of residential development in New Hampshire.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a commission to study barriers to increased density of residential development in New Hampshire.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-20HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Municipal and County Government
2023-01-26SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2023-0123s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/26/2023; Senate Journal 5
2023-01-26SenateCommittee Amendment # 2023-0123s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/26/2023; Senate Journal 5
2023-01-26SenateCommittee Amendment # 2023-0056s, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote; 01/26/2023; Senate Journal 5
2023-01-19SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0056s, 01/26/2023; Senate Calendar 7
2023-01-19SenateSen. Perkins Kwoka Moved to Remove SB 47 from the Consent Calendar; 01/19/2023; Senate Journal 4
2023-01-19SenateSpecial Order to Next Session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 01/19/2023; Senate Journal 4
2023-01-17SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0056s, 01/19/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 6A
2023-01-12SenateHearing: 01/17/2023, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 6
2023-01-11SenateIntroduced 01/05/2023 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback