NH SB47 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB47
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-06 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-06 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to enforcement of election laws.
Title
Relative to enforcement of election laws.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/29/2017; Senate Journal 11 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/29/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 16 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Hearing: 01/24/2017, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 7 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Introduced 01/05/2017 and Referred to Election Law and Internal Affairs; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB47 (Carry Over) 2017-12-06 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar