NH SB47 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-11 - Signed by the Governor on 05/07/2015; Chapter 0040 Effective 07/06/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Repealing the payment of subminimum wages to persons with disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repealing the payment of subminimum wages to persons with disabilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-05 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-11SenateSigned by the Governor on 05/07/2015; Chapter 0040 Effective 07/06/2015
2015-04-29SenateEnrolled (In recess 4/9/2015); Senate Journal 12
2015-04-29HouseEnrolled; House Journal 36, PG. 1597
2015-04-15HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 34, PG. 1559
2015-03-26HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for Apr 15 (Vote 16-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 29, PG. 1309
2015-03-19HouseExecutive Session: 3/25/2015 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307
2015-03-19HousePublic Hearing: 3/24/2015 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307
2015-03-11HouseIntroduced and Referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services; House Journal 26, PG. 1274
2015-03-05SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 7
2015-02-20SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/5/15; Senate Calendar 11
2015-01-29SenateHearing: 2/10/15, Room 100, State House, 1:15 p.m.; Senate Calendar 8
2015-01-08SenateIntroduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback