NH SB468 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-24 - Executive Session: 10/10/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building202
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-24 - Executive Session: 10/10/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building202
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to fines and penalties collected by the department of environmental services.
Title
Relative to fines and penalties collected by the department of environmental services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-24 | House | Executive Session: 10/10/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building202 |
2018-08-28 | House | Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 09/13/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building202 |
2018-04-05 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 7 |
2018-03-28 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 04/05/2018 (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 6 |
2018-03-28 | House | Executive Session: 03/27/2018 Legislative Office Building 202 |
2018-03-21 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/27/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2018-03-14 | House | Public Hearing: 03/20/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 7 P. 52 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0609s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0609s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0609s, 02/22/2018; Senate Calendar 8 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Hearing: 02/06/2018, Room 103, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 6 |
2017-12-20 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 1 |