NH SB467 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to certain procedures conducted in teaching hospitals.
Title
Relative to certain procedures conducted in teaching hospitals.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Ruth Ward [R] | Sen. James Gray [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. David Starr [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] |
Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Sen. Jay Kahn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Hearing: 01/14/2020, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:30 pm; Senate Calendar 2 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |