NH SB467 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-01 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-01 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the state art fund.
Title
Relative to the state art fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3 |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 02/01/2018; Senate Calendar 5 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Hearing: 01/16/2018, Room 103, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 3 |
2017-12-21 | Senate | ==CANCELLED== Hearing: 01/09/2018, Room 103, State House, 01:35 pm; Senate Calendar 49 |
2017-12-20 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 1 |