NH SB466 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on December 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to political activities of commissioners of state agencies.
Title
Relative to political activities of commissioners of state agencies.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Woodburn [D] | Sen. Kevin Cavanaugh [D] | Sen. Dan Feltes [D] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] |
Sen. Martha Hennessey [D] | Sen. Jay Kahn [D] | Sen. Bette Lasky [D] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] |
Sen. David Watters [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/15/2018; Senate Calendar 12 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Hearing: 02/14/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:20 am; Senate Calendar 7 |
2017-12-20 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 1 |