NH SB465 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on December 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-01 - Pending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to documentation requirements for the department of labor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to documentation requirements for the department of labor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-01 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-01SenatePending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3
2018-02-01SenateSen. Carson Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 13Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3
2018-01-24SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 02/01/2018; Senate Calendar 5
2018-01-05SenateHearing: 01/17/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 2A
2017-12-20SenateTo Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback