NH SB460 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Signed by the Governor on 05/05/2016; Chapter 0056; Effective 07/04/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Signed by the Governor on 05/05/2016; Chapter 0056; Effective 07/04/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to a school board's duty to ensure the teaching of health and physical education as it relates to abused children.
Title
Relative to a school board's duty to ensure the teaching of health and physical education as it relates to abused children.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/05/2016; Chapter 0056; Effective 07/04/2016 |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/28/2016); Senate Journal 16 |
2016-04-28 | House | Enrolled 04/20/2016 House Journal 36 P. 53 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Sen. Reagan Moved to Concur with House Amendments # 1196h, New Title, and #1241h, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/14/2016; Senate Journal 13 |
2016-04-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1196h and 1241h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/06/2016 House Journal 31 P. 20 |
2016-04-06 | House | FLAM #2016-1241h (NT) (Rep. Ladd): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/06/2016 House Journal 31 P. 20 |
2016-04-06 | House | Amendment #2016-1196h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/06/2016 House Journal 31 P. 19 |
2016-04-06 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Ladd) 04/06/2016 House Journal 31 P. 4 |
2016-03-30 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1196h (NT) for 04/06/2016 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 21 P. 8 |
2016-03-22 | House | Executive Session: 03/29/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2016-03-08 | House | Public Hearing: 03/17/2016 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2016-02-17 | House | Introduced 02/11/2016 and referred to Education House Journal 17 P. 51 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/11/2016; Senate Journal 5 |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/11/2016; Senate Calendar 5 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Hearing: 02/02/2016, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:50 am; Senate Calendar 4 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Introduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 1 |