NH SB459 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Signed by the Governor on 06/25/2018; Chapter 0321; Effective 08/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Signed by the Governor on 06/25/2018; Chapter 0321; Effective 08/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to reciprocity for licensure as a real estate broker or salesperson.
Title
Relative to reciprocity for licensure as a real estate broker or salesperson.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Sen. Daniel Innis [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] |
Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Rep. Lynne Ober [R] | Rep. John Hunt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/25/2018; Chapter 0321; Effective 08/24/2018 |
2018-06-05 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2018-2031c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2018; Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-23 | House | Conference Committee Report 2031c: Adopted, Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-17 | House | Conference Committee Report # 2018-2031c Filed 05/17/2018; As Amended by the House |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/16/2018, 09:30 am, Room 103, State House |
2018-05-10 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Hansen, P. Schmidt, McGuire, Woitkun 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. McGuire): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Reagan, Carson, Soucy; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-02 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1749h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2018 |
2018-05-02 | House | Amendment # 2018-1749h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2018 |
2018-04-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1749h for 05/02/2018 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 6 |
2018-04-25 | House | Executive Session: 04/24/2018 Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-03-27 | House | Public Hearing: 04/11/2018 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-03-20 | House | Introduced 03/15/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 8 P. 70 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/15/2018; Senate Calendar 12 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Hearing: 02/14/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:40 am; Senate Calendar 7 |
2017-12-20 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 1 |