NH SB455 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - Pending Motion Committee Amendment #2016-0397s; 03/03/2016; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - Pending Motion Committee Amendment #2016-0397s; 03/03/2016; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to immunity for injuries from the possession or use of a firearm by an employee or official of a political subdivision.
Title
Relative to immunity for injuries from the possession or use of a firearm by an employee or official of a political subdivision.
Sponsors
Sen. David Boutin [R] | Rep. John O'Connor [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] |
Sen. John Reagan [R] | Rep. Charlene Takesian [R] | Rep. Marjorie Porter [D] | Sen. Gary Daniels [R] |
Sen. Jerry Little [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | Senate | Pending Motion Committee Amendment #2016-0397s; 03/03/2016; Senate Journal 7 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/03/2016; Senate Journal 7 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0397s, 03/03/2016; Senate Calendar 7 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Special Order SB 455-FN to 03/03/2016, Without Objection, Motion Adopted |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0397s, 02/18/2016; Senate Calendar 6 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Special Order SB 455-FN to 02/18/2016, Without Objection, Motion Adopted |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0397s, 02/11/2016; Senate Calendar 5 |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Hearing: 01/20/2016, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 2 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Introduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1 |