NH SB451 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/03/2016; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/03/2016; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to insurance coverage for massage therapy.
Title
Relative to insurance coverage for massage therapy.
Sponsors
Sen. Sam Cataldo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/03/2016; Senate Journal 7 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 03/03/2016; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 7 |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Hearing: 02/02/2016, Room 100, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 4 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Introduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 1 |