NH SB45 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-04 - Sen. Bradley Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment 2544h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 4
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-04 - Sen. Bradley Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment 2544h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 4
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study opioid use in workers' compensation cases.
Title
Establishing a committee to study opioid use in workers' compensation cases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-04 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment 2544h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 4 |
2016-01-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2544h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 47 |
2016-01-06 | House | Amendment #2015-2544h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 47 |
2015-11-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2544h (NT) for Jan 6 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 8-9 |
2015-10-14 | House | Executive Session: 10/29/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 |
2015-10-14 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 10/22/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 |
2015-08-26 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 9/8/2015 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2015-05-28 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-05-20 | House | Executive Session: 5/28/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2015-05-20 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 5/28/2015 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2015-04-29 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 5/5/2015 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2015-04-16 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/21/2015 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2015-03-25 | House | Public Hearing: 4/7/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2015-03-24 | House | Introduced and Referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services (in recess of 3/12/2015); House Journal 26, PG. 1276 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 0819s and 0924s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 9 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment #2015-0924s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0819s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0819s, 3/19/15; Senate Calendar 13 |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Hearing:=== RESCHEDULED === 2/3/15, Room 100, State House, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 8 |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Hearing:=== CANCELLED === 1/27/15, Room 100, State House, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 7 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4 |