NH SB447 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 173-161 05/03/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 173-161 05/03/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to issuance of renewable energy certificates.
Title
Relative to issuance of renewable energy certificates.
Sponsors
Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. Jeff Woodburn [D] | Rep. Robert Backus [D] | Rep. Peter Somssich [D] |
Rep. Herbert Richardson [R] | Rep. Howard Moffett [D] | Rep. Suzanne Harvey [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - House - ITL (Y: 173 N: 161 NV: 25 Abs: 32) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 173-161 05/03/2018 |
2018-04-25 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2018-04-25 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 05/02/2018 (Vote 12-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 24 |
2018-04-25 | House | Executive Session: 04/18/2018 Legislative Office Building 304 |
2018-04-10 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/18/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2018-03-28 | House | ==ROOM CHANGE== Public Hearing: 04/11/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2018-03-27 | House | Introduced 03/22/2018 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 10 P. 53 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1085s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/21/2018; Senate Journal 9 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-1085s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/21/2018; Senate Journal 9 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1085s, 03/21/2018; Senate Calendar 13 |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Hearing: 01/30/2018, Room 103, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 4 |
2017-12-20 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 1 |