NH SB447 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-26 - II. Remainder Effective 01/21/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-26 - II. Remainder Effective 01/21/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to study Narcan.
Title
Establishing a commission to study Narcan.
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Sanborn [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Sen. David Boutin [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
Sen. Sam Cataldo [R] | Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-26 | Senate | II. Remainder Effective 01/21/2016 |
2016-01-26 | Senate | I. Section 2 Effective 11/01/2017 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 01/21/2016; Chapter 0001 Senate Journal 3 |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 01/14/2016); Senate Journal 2 |
2016-01-20 | House | Enrolled 01/20/2016 House Journal 8 P. 34 |
2016-01-20 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 275-71 01/20/2016 House Journal 8 P. 2 |
2016-01-19 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 01/20/2016 (Vote 14-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 2 P. 1 |
2016-01-15 | House | Executive Session: 01/15/2016 09:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building204 |
2016-01-06 | House | Joint Public Hearing with the Senate Judiciary Committee: 01/12/2016 09:00 Amendment Reps Hall |
2016-01-14 | House | Introduced 01/07/2016 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 6 P. 44 |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0049s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/14/2016; Senate Journal 2 |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0049s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/14/2016 |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0049s, New Title, 01/14/2016; Senate Calendar 1A |
2016-01-08 | Senate | Joint Hearing with the House Criminal Justice Committee: 01/12/2016, Representatives' Hall, State House 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 1 |
2015-12-31 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1 |