NH SB446 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Passed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - Veto Sustained 09/13/2018: Regular Calendar 213-128 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to net energy metering limits for customer-generators.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to net energy metering limits for customer-generators.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-09-13 - Senate - VETO MESSAGE - Roll Call Required (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Senate - Veto Override (Y: 213 N: 128 NV: 21 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Adopt Amendment (Y: 116 N: 213 NV: 30 Abs: 32) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-13HouseVeto Sustained 09/13/2018: Regular Calendar 213-128 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote
2018-09-13SenateNotwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB 446 Become Law: Regular Calendar 21Y-3N, Veto Overridden by necessary two-thirds vote; 09/13/2018; Senate Journal 19
2018-06-20SenateVetoed by Governor 06/19/2018
2018-05-29SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-05-29HouseEnrolled 05/23/2018
2018-05-10SenateSen. Avard Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17
2018-05-03HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 1742h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/03/2018
2018-05-03HouseFLAM # 2018-1826h (Rep. Harrington): Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 116-213 05/03/2018
2018-05-03HouseAmendment # 2018-1742h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/03/2018
2018-05-02HouseRemoved from Consent (Rep. Harrington) 05/02/2018
2018-04-25HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1742h for 05/02/2018 (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 8
2018-04-25HouseExecutive Session: 04/24/2018 Legislative Office Building 304
2018-04-19HouseFull Committee Work Session: 04/24/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 304
2018-04-19HousePublic Hearing on Amendment # 2018-1645h: 04/24/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 304
2018-04-19HouseRecommit (Rep. Barry): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 18
2018-04-19HouseSpecial Order to next order of business (Rep. Barry): Motion Adopted DV 254-79 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 17
2018-04-19HouseRemoved from Consent (Rep. Harrington) 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 2
2018-04-11HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1357h for 04/19/2018 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 9
2018-04-11HouseExecutive Session: 04/04/2018 Legislative Office Building 304
2018-03-28HouseFull Committee Work Session: 04/04/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304
2018-03-21HousePublic Hearing: 03/28/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304
2018-03-20HouseIntroduced 03/15/2018 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 8 P. 70
2018-03-14SenateOught to Pass with Amendments 2018-0972s and 2018-1021s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/14/2018; Senate Journal 7
2018-03-14SenateSen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2018-1021s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2018; Senate Journal 7
2018-03-14SenateCommittee Amendment # 2018-0972s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2018; Senate Journal 7
2018-03-08SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0972s, 03/14/2018; Senate Calendar 11
2018-03-08SenateSpecial Order to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6
2018-03-08SenateSen. Bradley Moved to Remove SB 446 from the Consent Calendar; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6
2018-03-06SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0972s, 03/08/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 10A
2018-01-10SenateHearing: 01/23/2018, Room 103, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 3
2017-12-20SenateTo Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2961&sy=2018&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB446
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&id=1977&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=1977
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=1977
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=221&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=SB0446&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB446&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2961
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=252&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=SB0446&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB446&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2961
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=267&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=SB0446&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB446&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2961

Bill Comments

feedback