NH SB445 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on August 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-08 - Signed by the Governor on 08/07/2018; Chapter 0377; Effective 08/07/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on August 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-08 - Signed by the Governor on 08/07/2018; Chapter 0377; Effective 08/07/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Designating the Warner River as a protected river.
Title
Designating the Warner River as a protected river.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Feltes [D] | Sen. Ruth Ward [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] |
Rep. Clyde Carson [D] | Rep. John Mullen [R] | Rep. Suzanne Smith [D] | Rep. Mel Myler [D] |
Rep. David Luneau [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-08 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 08/07/2018; Chapter 0377; Effective 08/07/2018 |
2018-05-09 | House | Enrolled 05/03/2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/03/2018); Senate Journal 17 |
2018-04-26 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 242-60 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-18 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2018-04-18 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/26/2018 (Vote 14-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 15 |
2018-04-18 | House | Executive Session: 04/17/2018 Legislative Office Building 305 |
2018-04-12 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/17/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2018-03-14 | House | ==TIME CHANGE== Public Hearing: 04/03/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 7 P. 51 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3 |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/01/2018; Senate Calendar 5 |
2017-12-21 | Senate | Hearing: 01/16/2018, Room 103, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 49 |
2017-12-20 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 1 |